Gabriel Le Coigneux م 1687 و 1741 - الشجرة كاملة
From Rodovid AR
الشّخص:1496295
Generation of a large tree takes a lot of resources of our web server. Anonymous users can only see 7 generations of ancestors and 7 - of descendants on the full tree to decrease server loading by search engines. If you wish to see a full tree without registration, add text ?showfulltree=yes directly to the end of URL of this page. Please, don't use direct link to a full tree anywhere else.
This tree contains: 26 families with 66 people in 24 lineages, 39 of these people are blood relatives; 8 families with 8 people are hidden.
1
1
2
2
3
3
4
4
5
♂ Jacques Ier Le Coigneux
الميلاد: 1555 ? 1560
الممتلكات العقارات: seigneur de Sandricourt, Faudrievert et de Boisguillaume,
العمل: conseiller en la Grande Chambre du parlement de Paris (06/04/1576, 1582)
الزواج: ♀ Geneviève de Montholon
الوفاة: 17 فبراير 1623 ? 18 فبراير 1623, Paris (75)
الممتلكات العقارات: seigneur de Sandricourt, Faudrievert et de Boisguillaume,
العمل: conseiller en la Grande Chambre du parlement de Paris (06/04/1576, 1582)
الزواج: ♀ Geneviève de Montholon
الوفاة: 17 فبراير 1623 ? 18 فبراير 1623, Paris (75)
5
الأجداد
الأجداد
الأولياء
♂ Jaques Le Coigneux
اللقب المميّز: marquis de Montmélian
اللقب المميّز: marquis de Morfontaine
الممتلكات العقارات: seigneur de Vallière,
العمل: Président à mortier au parlement de Paris
الزواج: ♀ Judith-Thérèse Montaut Benard de Navailles
الزواج: ♀ Angélique Le Camus
الزواج: ♀ Marie d’Aloigny
العمل: 1644, conseiller du Roi au Parlement
اللقب المميّز: marquis de Morfontaine
الممتلكات العقارات: seigneur de Vallière,
العمل: Président à mortier au parlement de Paris
الزواج: ♀ Judith-Thérèse Montaut Benard de Navailles
الزواج: ♀ Angélique Le Camus
الزواج: ♀ Marie d’Aloigny
العمل: 1644, conseiller du Roi au Parlement
الأولياء
== 8 ==
♂ Jacques Le Coigneux
الميلاد: 6 مارس 1683
اللقب المميّز: Bélâbre (36), marquis de Belabre
العمل: Brigadier des armées du roi
العمل: Mestre de camp du régiment de dragons de son nom
معموديّة: 30 مارس 1683
الوفاة: 18 يناير 1728
اللقب المميّز: Bélâbre (36), marquis de Belabre
العمل: Brigadier des armées du roi
العمل: Mestre de camp du régiment de dragons de son nom
معموديّة: 30 مارس 1683
الوفاة: 18 يناير 1728
== 8 ==