Francisca Zeledón Mora - جرد الجدول
From Rodovid AR
الشّخص:645458
Generation of a large tree takes a lot of resources of our web server. Anonymous users can only see 7 generations of ancestors and 7 - of descendants on the full tree to decrease server loading by search engines. If you wish to see a full tree without registration, add text ?showfulltree=yes directly to the end of URL of this page. Please, don't use direct link to a full tree anywhere else.
11/1 ♀ Francisca Zeledón Mora [Zeledón] 2
21/2 <1+?> ♂ Jose Joaquín Rodríguez Zeledón [Rodríguez]
الميلاد: 6 يناير 1838, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <1> ♀ Luisa Alvarado Carrillo [Alvarado] م 7 ديسمبر 1853 و 3 يونيو 1943
اللقب المميّز: 8 مايو 1890 - 1 مايو 1894, Presidente de la República de Costa Rica, 15°
الوفاة: 30 نوفمبر 1917, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <1> ♀ Luisa Alvarado Carrillo [Alvarado] م 7 ديسمبر 1853 و 3 يونيو 1943
اللقب المميّز: 8 مايو 1890 - 1 مايو 1894, Presidente de la República de Costa Rica, 15°
الوفاة: 30 نوفمبر 1917, San José, Costa Rica
· Se firmaron los contratos para establecer el primer servicio telefónico en 1891. · Favoreció la educación y creó escuelas nocturnas para adultos. · Inició la construcción del Teatro Nacional en 1890.
· Promovió la inmigración europea para la colonización y desarrollo agrícola del país.
32/2 <1+?> ♂ Pedro Pérez Zeledón [Pérez]
الميلاد: 4 يناير 1854, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <2> ♀ Vicenta Calvo Mora [Calvo] , El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
الوفاة: 31 مايو 1930, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <2> ♀ Vicenta Calvo Mora [Calvo] , El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
الوفاة: 31 مايو 1930, San José, Costa Rica
3
41/3 <2+1> ♀ Manuela Ramona Petronila de la Trinidad Rodriguez Alvarado [Rodríguez]الميلاد: 23 فبراير 1872, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <3> ♂ Rafael Anselmo José Yglesias Castro [Yglesias] م 16 ابريل 1861 و 11 ابريل 1924, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: 1894 - 1902, Primera Dama de la República
الوفاة: 28 مارس 1953, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <3> ♂ Rafael Anselmo José Yglesias Castro [Yglesias] م 16 ابريل 1861 و 11 ابريل 1924, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: 1894 - 1902, Primera Dama de la República
الوفاة: 28 مارس 1953, San José, Costa Rica
4
81/4 <4+3> ♀ Luisa Josefa de Jesús Yglesias Rodríguez [Yglesias]التعميد: 24 October 1893, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <4> ♂ w Franz von Tattenbach [Tattenbach] م 13 سبتمبر 1896, La Merced, San José (Costa Rica)
62/4 <4+3> ♂ Manuel Antonio Yglesias Rodríguez [Yglesias] الزواج: <4> ♂ w Franz von Tattenbach [Tattenbach] م 13 سبتمبر 1896, La Merced, San José (Costa Rica)
التعميد: 8 يوليو 1900, El Carmen, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino: Carlos Iglesias Castro Madrina: Enriqueta Rodríguez
الزواج: <5> ♀ Angelina del Carmen Echeverría Velázquez [Echeverría] c. 18 مارس 1904, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Testigos: Guillermo Esquivel y Margarita Iglesias (matrimonio)
الزواج: <5> ♀ Angelina del Carmen Echeverría Velázquez [Echeverría] c. 18 مارس 1904, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Testigos: Guillermo Esquivel y Margarita Iglesias (matrimonio)
73/4 <4+3> ♂ Eduardo Gonzálo de Jesús Yglesias Rodríguez [Yglesias]
54/4 <4+3> ♂ José Miguel del Socorro Iglesias Rodríguez [Yglesias] الميلاد: 15 ديسمبر 1904, San José, Costa Rica, Nace a las 5:00 am
التعميد: 7 يونيو 1905, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino: Demetrio Yglesias Madrina: Elena Alvarado
الزواج: <6> ♀ Carmen Vera de los Ángeles Tinoco Rodríguez [Tinoco] م 10 فبراير 1914 و 14 يناير 2010, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
التعميد: 7 يونيو 1905, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino: Demetrio Yglesias Madrina: Elena Alvarado
الزواج: <6> ♀ Carmen Vera de los Ángeles Tinoco Rodríguez [Tinoco] م 10 فبراير 1914 و 14 يناير 2010, El Carmen, San José, San José, Costa Rica
الميلاد: 21 سبتمبر 1907, San José, San José, Costa Rica
التعميد: 24 October 1907, Nuestra Señora de las Mercedes, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino:[[Persona:642083]] Madrina: Luisa Iglesias Rodríguez
التعميد: 24 October 1907, Nuestra Señora de las Mercedes, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino:[[Persona:642083]] Madrina: Luisa Iglesias Rodríguez
5
131/5 <8+4> ♂ Cristian Franz Rafael Tattenbach Yglesias [Tattenbach]
102/5 <6+5> ♂ Manuel Rafael de Jesús Yglesias Echeverría [Yglesias] التعميد: 17 فبراير 1924, Nuestra Señora de las Mercedes, San José (Costa Rica), Pate: [[Person:635715]]
التعميد: 28 يونيو 1926, Nuestra Señora de las Mercedes, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino: Emilio Echeverría Madrina: [[Persona:635709]]
الزواج: <7> ♀ Ana Isabel Emilia del Carmen Piza Escalante [Piza] c. 15 يوليو 1934, Alajuela, Costa Rica
93/5 <6+5> ♂ Francisco José Yglesias Echeverría [Yglesias] الزواج: <7> ♀ Ana Isabel Emilia del Carmen Piza Escalante [Piza] c. 15 يوليو 1934, Alajuela, Costa Rica
التعميد: 3 يناير 1928, Nuestra Señora de las Mercedes, San José, San José, Costa Rica, Padrino: Víctor Iglesias Madrina: Blanca Echeverría
114/5 <6+5> ♀ Angelina María Yglesias Echeverría [Yglesias] الميلاد: 16 ديسمبر 1931, San José, Costa Rica
125/5 <7+6> ♀ Sonia Yglesias Tinoco [Yglesias] الميلاد: 3 أغسطس 1949, Caracas, Venezuela
الزواج: <8> ♂ Juan José Llobet Sáenz [Llobet] , San José, Costa Rica
الزواج: <8> ♂ Juan José Llobet Sáenz [Llobet] , San José, Costa Rica
6
141/6 <10+7> ♂ Ramón María Yglesias Piza [Yglesias]الميلاد: 1 سبتمبر 1961, San José, San José, Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: مايو 2001 - مايو 2002, San José, Costa Rica, Viceministro de Comercio Exterior del Gobierno de Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: أغسطس 2002 - October 2002, San José, Costa Rica, Presidente Ejecutivo del Instituto Costarricense de Puertos del Pacífico
152/6 <12+8> ♀ Gabriela Llobet Yglesias [Llobet] اللقب المميّز: مايو 2001 - مايو 2002, San José, Costa Rica, Viceministro de Comercio Exterior del Gobierno de Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: أغسطس 2002 - October 2002, San José, Costa Rica, Presidente Ejecutivo del Instituto Costarricense de Puertos del Pacífico
الميلاد: 8 يوليو 1971, San José, San José, Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: 8 مارس 2002 - 30 سبتمبر 2004, San José, Costa Rica, Viceministro de Comercio Exterior del Gobierno de Costa Rica
اللقب المميّز: 8 مارس 2002 - 30 سبتمبر 2004, San José, Costa Rica, Viceministro de Comercio Exterior del Gobierno de Costa Rica